New Hampshire District Court
Judge:Landya B Mccafferty
Case #: 1:14-cv-00562
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2014
Terminated:Sep 03, 2015
Last checked: Monday Jun 15, 2015 10:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Donald F. Donovan
Represented By
Michael J. Iacopino
Brennan Lenehan Iacopino & Hickey
contact info
Iryna N. Dore
contact info
Defendant
Donovan Equipment Company, Inc.
Represented By
Michael J. Iacopino
Brennan Lenehan Iacopino & Hickey
contact info
Iryna N. Dore
contact info
Defendant
Ian D. Finnie
Represented By
Michael J. Iacopino
Brennan Lenehan Iacopino & Hickey
contact info
Iryna N. Dore
contact info
Defendant - Stayed
Donald F Donovan
6 Enterprise Drive
Londonderry, NH 03053
Defendant - Stayed
Donovan Equipment Company, Inc.
6 Enterprise Drive
Londonderry, NH 03053
Defendant - Stayed
Ian D Finnie
278 Brown Hill Rd
Belknap, NH 03223
Plaintiff
Brian Reed
Represented By
Karen E. Hewes
Hewes Law Offices
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, September 03, 2015
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 09/03 8:17 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (ko)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2015
30 30 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 09/02 3:01 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Donald F. Donovan, Donovan Equipment Company, Inc., Ian D. Finnie(Iacopino, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 09/03 8:11 AM
ENDORSED ORDER re 30 Stipulation of Dismissal. Text of Order: The court dismisses the action with prejudice pursuant to the parties' request (doc. no. 30). To the extent the parties request the court to retain continuing jurisdiction over the action, the request is denied. The court's jurisdiction ends when the case is closed. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(ko)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2015
notice Case Settlement Mon 08/03 2:47 PM
Michael J. Iacopino advised case settled. Agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of dismissal to be filed within 30 days or the court will dismiss the case with prejudice. Case Settlement Deadline 9/8/2015.(ko)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2015
order Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond Mon 07/13 11:14 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 29 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond re 27 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint to August 3, 2015 and to extend time to file responsive pleading under Rule 12. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Objection on 8/3/2015.(ko)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2015
29 29 motion Extend Time to Object/Respond Fri 07/10 4:19 PM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to27 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint to August 3, 2015 and to extend time to file responsive pleading under Rule 12 filed by Donald F. Donovan, Donovan Equipment Company, Inc., Ian D. Finnie.(Dore, Iryna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2015
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 07/02 11:13 AM
ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice 14 Motion to Dismiss. Text of Order: Denied without prejudice pursuant to LR 15.1(c) in light of doc. no. 27. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(ko)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2015
28 28 respm Surreply to Reply Tue 06/30 10:30 AM
SURREPLY to Reply to14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brian Reed. (Hewes, Karen)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2015
27 27 motion Leave to File Mon 06/29 12:00 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Brian Reed. Follow up on Objection on 7/16/2015.(Hewes, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law to File Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Amended Complaint
26 26 motion Leave to Appeal Mon 06/29 11:24 AM
Assented to Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Reply to14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brian Reed.(Hewes, Karen) Modified on 6/29/2015 to correct title of motion. (ko)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Surreply Memorandum
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal Tue 06/30 8:15 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 26 Assented to Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Reply to 14 MOTION to Dismiss. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the instant motion using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(ko)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2015
25 25 notice Intent to Surreply Mon 06/15 11:27 AM
Notice of Intent to Surreply to Reply to14 MOTION to Dismiss . Surreply Follow Up on 7/2/2015.(Hewes, Karen)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 12, 2015
24 24 respm Reply to Objection to Motion Fri 06/12 5:37 PM
REPLY to Objection to Motion re14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Donald F. Donovan, Donovan Equipment Company, Inc., Ian D. Finnie. (Iacopino, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2015
23 23 respm Objection to Motion Fri 06/05 3:24 PM
OBJECTION to14 MOTION to Dismiss Replaces doc. no's. 19, 20, 21 & 22 filed by Brian Reed.(Hewes, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law Plaintiff's Memorandum,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A Original Charge,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B Amended Charge
22 22 misc Exhibit Fri 06/05 2:25 PM
Exhibit (Attachment #3) Replaces doc. no. 21 to20 Objection to Motion,21 Exhibit by Brian Reed.(Hewes, Karen)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Exhibit Fri 06/05 11:28 AM
Exhibit (Attachment 3) Amended Charge to20 Objection to Motion by Brian Reed.(Hewes, Karen)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Objection to Motion Fri 06/05 11:20 AM
OBJECTION to14 MOTION to Dismiss Replaces doc. no. 19 filed by Brian Reed.(Hewes, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law Plaintiff's Memorandum,
Att: 2 Exhibit Original Charge
Thursday, June 04, 2015
notice Personal Identifier Thu 06/04 10:40 AM
NOTICE re19 Objection to Motion filed by Brian Reed. Although the clerk's office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that the above-referenced document contains personal identifiers in violation of Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2. Counsel may remedy this violation by filing a redacted document in its entirety using the appropriate event, link to the previously filed document, and enter in docket text Replaces doc. no. 19. If a redacted copy is filed, the previously filed unredacted document will remain on file but will be sealed to the public. No description of exhibit or attachment was included. Exhibit or attachment shall be followed by a short description of the document and shall not exceed five words. AP 2.5(a). See[LINK:Properly Attach Exhibits to Pleadings in ECF] .If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the case manager at 603-225-1473.(ko)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2015
19 19 respm Objection to Motion Wed 06/03 9:11 PM
OBJECTION to14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brian Reed.(Hewes, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Thursday, May 28, 2015
order Order on Discovery Plan Thu 05/28 3:52 PM
ENDORSED ORDER approving 18 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 5-6 days. Case Track: Standard. Text of Order: Approved and adopted as a pretrial scheduling order with the following modifications: Defendant's disclosure of experts: January 1, 2016. Trial: During the two week period beginning June 21, 2016. The June 2, 2015 pretrial conference is cancelled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/29/2016. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 8/3/2015.(ko)
Related: [-]
notice Trial Notice Thu 05/28 4:00 PM
TRIAL NOTICE: Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/29/2016. Pretrial Statements due 5/17/2016. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 5/31/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/7/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Landya B. McCafferty. JERS Statement due 6/7/2016. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 6/21/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (ko)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2015
18 18 motion Discovery Plan Wed 05/27 4:35 PM
Proposed Discovery Plan (Agreed to by the Parties) filed by Donald F. Donovan, Donovan Equipment Company, Inc., Ian D. Finnie. (Iacopino, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Extend Time to Object/Respond Wed 05/27 8:33 AM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to14 MOTION to Dismiss to June 3, 2015 filed by Brian Reed.(Hewes, Karen)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond Wed 05/27 9:49 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 17 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond re 14 Motion to Dismiss to June 3, 2015. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Objection on 6/3/2015.(jbw)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2015
order Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond Mon 05/04 9:40 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 16 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to 14 MOTION to Dismiss to 5/28/2015. Text of Order: Granted. The deadline for Reed's objection/response to the Motion to Dismiss (doc. no. 14) is extended to May 28, 2015. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Objection on 5/28/2015.(ko)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 01, 2015
16 16 motion Extend Time to Object/Respond Fri 05/01 4:50 PM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to14 MOTION to Dismiss to 5/28/2015 filed by Brian Reed.(Hewes, Karen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 29, 2015
notice Pretrial Conference Wed 04/29 10:06 AM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2015 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 5/27/2015. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 28, 2015
order Order on Motion to Exceed Wed 04/29 7:51 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 15 Motion to Exceed Page Limit (Memorandum of Law). Text of Order: Granted So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(ko)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2015
15 15 motion Exceed Mon 04/27 5:03 PM
Assented to MOTION to Exceed Page Limit (Memorandum of Law) filed by Donald F. Donovan, Donovan Equipment Company, Inc., Ian D. Finnie.(Dore, Iryna)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss Mon 04/27 4:59 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Donald F. Donovan, Donovan Equipment Company, Inc., Ian D. Finnie. Follow up on Objection on 5/14/2015.(Dore, Iryna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law
Thursday, March 19, 2015
13 13 notice Attorney Appearance Thu 03/19 9:24 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J. Iacopino on behalf of Ian D. Finnie Attorney Michael J. Iacopino added to party Ian D. Finnie(pty:dft).(Iacopino, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Attorney Appearance Thu 03/19 9:23 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J. Iacopino on behalf of Donovan Equipment Company, Inc. Attorney Michael J. Iacopino added to party Donovan Equipment Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Iacopino, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Attorney Appearance Thu 03/19 9:22 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J. Iacopino on behalf of Donald F. Donovan Attorney Michael J. Iacopino added to party Donald F. Donovan(pty:dft).(Iacopino, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Extend Time Thu 03/19 2:52 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 9 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to File Answer or Dispositive Motion. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 5/4/2015.(ko)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2015
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 03/18 3:11 PM
Disclosure Statement by Donovan Equipment Company, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Dore, Iryna)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extend Time Wed 03/18 3:10 PM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer or Dispositive Motion filed by Ian D. Finnie.(Dore, Iryna) Modified on 3/18/2015 to remove leave text (ko)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Attorney Appearance Wed 03/18 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Iryna N. Dore on behalf of Ian D. Finnie Attorney Iryna N. Dore added to party Ian D. Finnie(pty:dft).(Dore, Iryna)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Attorney Appearance Wed 03/18 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Iryna N. Dore on behalf of Donovan Equipment Company, Inc. Attorney Iryna N. Dore added to party Donovan Equipment Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Dore, Iryna)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Attorney Appearance Wed 03/18 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Iryna N. Dore on behalf of Donald F. Donovan Attorney Iryna N. Dore added to party Donald F. Donovan(pty:dft).(Dore, Iryna)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 09, 2015
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/09 4:49 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Donovan Equipment Company, Inc. by Brian Reed. Served/Mailed on 2/27/2015. Answer Follow Up on 5/4/2015.(Hewes, Karen)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/09 4:48 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Donald F. Donovan by Brian Reed. Served/Mailed on 2/27/2015. Answer Follow Up on 5/4/2015.(Hewes, Karen)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Return of Service Executed Mon 03/09 4:44 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Ian D. Finnie by Brian Reed. Served/Mailed on 3/3/2015. Answer Follow Up on 3/27/2015.(Hewes, Karen)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 22, 2014
2 2 service Summons - Waiver Issued Mon 12/22 9:52 AM
Summonses issued electronically as to Donald F. Donovan, Donovan Equipment Company, Inc., Ian D. Finnie. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(lml)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice ECF
notice Notice - ECF Mon 12/22 9:47 AM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] .(lml)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 17, 2014
1 1 cmp Complaint - New Case Wed 12/17 5:38 PM
NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1180265 filed by Brian Reed.(Hewes, Karen)
Related: [-]