New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian M Cogan
Case #: 1:25-cv-01833
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Terminated:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 11:06 AM EDT
Defendant
NATASSJA S. JACKSON
Defendant
QUALITY TRANSPORTATION CORP.
Plaintiff
EMMANUELLA PHANORD


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
4 4 misc Letter Tue 04/08 2:16 PM
Letter re Withdrawing Petition by Natassja S. Jackson, Quality Transportation Corp. (Mantione, Alexys)
Related: [-]
order Order of Remand to State Court Tue 04/08 3:18 PM
ORDER REMANDING CASE to Supreme Court, Queens County, Index No. 724039/2024, on the ground that it was removed in violation of 28 U.S.C. § 1441(b)(2). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/8/2025. (PW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 04/03 2:47 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/03 2:06 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Natassja S. Jackson, Quality Transportation Corp. (Mantione, Alexys)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 04/03 11:54 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NATASSJA S. JACKSON, QUALITY TRANSPORTATION CORP. (Mantione, Alexys)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Thu 04/03 11:26 AM
Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information. Please file the Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Proposed Summons and pay the Civil Filing Fee for the following case so that it may be processed. Initial Case Opening Documents Should be Filed At The Time a Case Number is generated! (KD)
Related: [-]
misc Civil Case Filing Fee Thu 04/03 11:39 AM
CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18917737 (Mantione, Alexys)
Related: [-]
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/03 1:40 PM
Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit a completed 2 Page Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (KD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/03 2:42 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]
misc ECF Admission and Registration Notification - Removal Thu 04/03 2:48 PM
This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (KD)
Related: [-]
order Order to Show Cause Thu 04/03 3:43 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. By 4/10/2025, defendant shall show cause before this Court why this action should not be remanded to the Supreme Court, Queens County, as removed in violation of 28 U.S.C. § 1441(b)(2) (case may not be removed on diversity grounds "if any of the parties in interest properly joined and served as defendants is a citizen of the State in which such action is brought"). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/3/2025. (PW)
Related: [-]