Washington Western District Court
Case #: 3:25-cv-05283
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Terminated:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 8:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Defendant
TD Bank USA, N.A.
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff
Omar Abdi
Represented By
Craig B Sanders
Sanders Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 04, 2025
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 04/04 10:02 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. Incorrect divisional office selected by filer. Please see 2:25-cv-601-BJR for all filings in this matter. (MW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/03 7:28 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Equifax Information Services, LLC, TD Bank USA, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. with JURY DEMAND Related [+] Attorney Craig B Sanders added to party Omar Abdi(pty:pla) filed by Omar Abdi.(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8912782
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons as to Equifax Information Services, LLC,
Att: 3 Summons as to TD Bank USA, N.A.,
Att: 4 Summons as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.