Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean D Jordan
Case #: 4:25-cv-00344
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 11:09 AM CDT
Defendant
John Doe
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Paul Stephen Beik
Beik Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 order Order Tue 04/15 12:48 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. It is ORDERED that the following actions are now CONSOLIDATED as part of action numbered 4:22-CV-459 for all pretrial issues (except venue): 4:25-CV-344-SDJ, Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.85.69.236 ; 4:25-CV-347-SDJ, Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.186.83.61 . It is further ORDERED that the parties in the consolidated cases are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the lead case (4:22-CV-459). With these modifications, the prior consolidation orders remain in effect. The clerk's office is directed to make the changes necessary to effectuate this order. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 4/15/2025. (jmb)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Tue 04/15 12:52 PM
This civil action is CONSOLIDATED with cause 4:22-CV-459 designated as the Lead Case. All future pleadings (except relating to venue) are to be filed in the Lead Case. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
4 4 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/14 2:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Beik, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 03, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121) Thu 04/03 11:04 AM
Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121). AO 121 emailed to the Register of Copyrights.(Beik, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Thu 04/03 11:04 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Beik, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/03 11:03 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10763725.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Beik, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/03 11:20 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (CLC)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Thu 04/03 11:21 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (CLC)
Related: [-]