Rosa-Zelis v. Amazon.com, LLC et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jeremy D Kernodle |
Referred: | John D Love |
Case #: | 4:25-cv-00343 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Auto Negligence |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2025 |
Case in other court: | 416th District Court, Collin County, Texas, 416-01786-2025 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 11:09 AM CDT |
Defendant
Amazon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amazon.com
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amazon.com, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amazon.com, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Royalville Transport, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Abayuba Rosa-Zelis
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, April 11, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam B Reed on behalf of Abayuba Rosa-Zelis |
|
Thursday, April 10, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER. Any motion to remand shall be filed by no later than May 5, 2025. If no motion to remand is filed, by the same date, Plaintiff shall file a complaint in this federal case that complies with federal pleading standards. Defendants shall respond in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The filing of such pleadings will enable this court to commence with proceedings in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/10/25. (CLC) |
|
Wednesday, April 09, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER referring case to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 4/9/2025. (CLC) |
|
utility
Remark
Wed 04/09 3:15 PM
Courtesy file-marked copy of Order (Dkt.6 ) emailed to Plaintiff's attorney, Winston B. Line. (CLC) |
||
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER OF RECUSAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455, the undersigned hereby recuses himself in this case. The clerk of court is directed to reassign the case to another judge. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 4/8/2025. (CLC) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/08 8:54 AM
Case reassigned to District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. District Judge J. Campbell Barker no longer assigned to the case. (CLC) |
||
Thursday, April 03, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ORDER Regulating Practice. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 4/3/2025. (CLC) |
|
3 | 3
![]() ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to2 Petition by Amazon.com, LLC, Amazon, Amazon.com, Amazon.com, Inc.(CLC) |
|
2 | 2
![]() ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against Amazon, Amazon.com, Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon.com, LLC, John Doe, Royalville Transport, LLC, filed by Abayuba Rosa-Zelis.(CLC) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amazon.Com, Inc.,, Amazon.com, LLC, Amazon.com, Amazon from 416th Judicial District Court, Collin County, Texas, case number 416-01786-2025. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10763523), filed by Amazon.Com, Inc.,, Amazon.com, LLC, Amazon.com, Amazon.(Thornhill, Grant) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/03 10:53 AM
Case assigned to District Judge J. Campbell Barker. (CLC) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability
Thu 04/03 10:53 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (CLC) |
||
notice
Notice of ECF Requirement
Thu 04/03 10:55 AM
Notified Attorney, Winston B. Line and Michael Campbell, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. (CLC) |
||
utility
Remark
Thu 04/03 10:56 AM
Pursuant to Local Rule CV 7(j), any motion pending in another federal or state court made by any party will be considered moot at the time of transfer or removal unless they are re-urged in this court. (CLC) |