New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joseph A Marutollo
Case #: 1:25-cv-01846
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause15:1981 Fraud-Motor Vehicle (Odometer)
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 4:07 PM EDT
Defendant
PEPE CADILLAC INC.
Plaintiff
LAWRENCE ANNUNZIATA
Represented By
Reza Yassi
Yassi Law PC
contact info
Plaintiff
LISA ANNUNZIATA
Represented By
Reza Yassi
Yassi Law PC
contact info
Plaintiff
LISA S. DOZIER FUNERAL SERVICE INC
Represented By
Reza Yassi
Yassi Law PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 04/09 12:58 PM
Summons Issued as to Pepe Cadillac Inc.. (SG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
8 8 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/08 2:35 PM
Proposed Summons. by Lawrence Annunziata, Lisa Annunziata, Lisa S. Dozier Funeral Service Inc. (Yassi, Reza)
Related: [-]
order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/08 10:06 AM
ORDER: The in-person initial conference will now take place on June 13, 2025 at 2 p.m. in 324 North. All corresponding deadlines remain the same. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/8/2025. (EG)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
7 7 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/07 1:14 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held on June 10, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 324 North before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. The parties must complete the attached proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order and file it on ECF no later than June 5, 2025. Plaintiff is directed to ensure that all Defendants are aware of this conference. Counsel with knowledge of the case must attend the conference; per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. The parties are directed to review this Court's Individual Practices and Rules in advance of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/7/2025. (EG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Individual Practices and Rules
6 6 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 04/07 11:09 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Mon 04/07 10:57 AM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (SDM)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/07 10:55 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SDM)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Mon 04/07 11:05 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: No summons provided, please submit summons. The event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/04 3:38 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by LAWRENCE ANNUNZIATA, LISA ANNUNZIATA, LISA S. DOZIER FUNERAL SERVICE INC (Yassi, Reza)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Fri 04/04 8:36 AM
APPROVAL re2 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. Signed Brenna B. Mahoney, Clerk of Court by Tiffeny Lee-Harris, Case Administration Manager on 4/4/2025. (TLH)
Related: [-]
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/04 12:57 PM
Notice: Requires Newly Updated Civil Cover Sheet. The Civil cover sheet has been updated and The Clerk's Office requires the updated version of the civil cover sheet to continue to process this case. The form is available at:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/forms/js-44-civil-cover-sheet] Please resubmit using new JS44 under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
2 2 motion Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Thu 04/03 9:20 PM
First MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by LAWRENCE ANNUNZIATA, LISA ANNUNZIATA, LISA S. DOZIER FUNERAL SERVICE INC. (Yassi, Reza)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/03 3:20 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18919411 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by LISA ANNUNZIATA, LISA S. DOZIER FUNERAL SERVICE INC, LAWRENCE ANNUNZIATA. (Yassi, Reza)
Related: [-]