Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Gregory A Presnell
Referred: Daniel C Irick
Case #: 6:25-cv-00584
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/08 12:57 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice and denying 3 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/8/2025. (AKC)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
4 4 order Interested Persons Order Fri 04/04 9:29 AM
INITIAL CASE ORDER - Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement and notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/4/2025. (AKC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/03 4:50 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Robert Abraham Clark.(MSN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/03 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibit by Robert Abraham Clark re1 Complaint(MSN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/03 4:45 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Robert Abraham Clark.(MSN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope