Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Curtis L Collier
Referred: Michael J Dumitru
Case #: 1:25-cv-00113
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 5:13 PM EDT
Defendant
Lee University
Plaintiff
Caleb Nabors
Represented By
J. Gerard Stranch, IV
Stranch, Jennings & Garvey, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/11 5:57 PM
ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Samuel J. Strauss on behalf of Plaintiff Caleb Nabors. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Dumitru on 04/11/2025. (KRS)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/11 5:53 PM
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Raina C. Borrelli on behalf of Plaintiff Caleb Nabors. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Dumitru on 04/11/2025. (KRS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
10 10 5 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Mon 04/07 8:04 AM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 4/7/25. (ABF)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Mon 04/07 8:03 AM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 4/7/25. (ABF)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Mon 04/07 8:03 AM
Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 4/7/25. (ABF)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order Mon 04/07 7:57 AM
ORDER: The above-styled cases have been reviewed pursuant to E.D. Tenn. L.R. 3.2(d)(3), and the Court concludes these cases are related to previously filed case No. 1:25-cv-107-CLC-MJD, styled Michael Harris, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated v. Lee University. The Clerk of the Court is directed to assign these cases to the District Judge and Magistrate Judge assigned to the previously filed case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Dumitru on 4/7/25. (ABF)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/07 7:55 AM
District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Michael J Dumitru added. (ABF)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Mon 04/07 8:51 AM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNEDC-5956545.) filed by Caleb Nabors . (DCB)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/04 2:06 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNEDC-5956545.) by Caleb Nabors.(Strauss, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 04/04 11:30 AM
Summons Issued as to Lee University. (DCB)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Fri 04/04 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) re Samuel J. Strauss. Attorney is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (DCB)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Citizenship Fri 04/04 10:00 AM
Certificate of Citizenship by Caleb Nabors. (Stranch, J.)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/04 9:43 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNEDC-5956011.) by Caleb Nabors.(Borrelli, Raina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Fri 04/04 11:13 AM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNEDC-5956011.) filed by Caleb Nabors . (DCB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
1 1 33 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/03 4:35 PM
COMPLAINT Class Action against Lee University ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5955625.), filed by Caleb Nabors.(Stranch, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Lee University Summons