New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Diane Gujarati
Referred: Joseph A Marutollo
Case #: 1:25-cv-01856
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 6:06 PM EDT
Defendant
Harbor Hill Capital Group LLC
Plaintiff
Cristian Cuevas
Represented By
Zane Charles Hedaya
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 04, 2025
5 5 order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Order(Other) Fri 04/04 5:05 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 11:30 a.m. on May 21, 2025 in Courtroom 324 North before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. The parties must complete the attached proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order and file it on ECF no later than May 14, 2025. Counsel attending the conference must have knowledge of the case; per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. The parties are directed to review this Court's Individual Practices and Rules, attached herewith, in advance of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/4/2025. (PCM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Individual Practices and Rules
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 04/04 11:04 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 04/04 11:04 AM
Summons Issued as to Harbor Hill Capital Group LLC. (CV)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 04/04 11:02 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CV)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/04 11:01 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/03 6:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Harbor Hill Capital Group LLC filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18920469 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -N/A,, filed by Cristian Cuevas. (Hedaya, Zane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet