New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Hector Gonzalez
Case #: 1:25-cv-01858
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 1:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Long Island University
Plaintiff
Ajay Suresh
Represented By
Rebecca Arielle Kornhauser
Sriplaw, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Report on Copyright AO121 Mon 04/14 2:45 PM
Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (RC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 complaint,
Att: 2 exhibit A
Friday, April 04, 2025
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 04/04 8:55 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 04/04 8:54 AM
Summons Issued as to Long Island University. (CV)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 04/04 8:39 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CV)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/04 8:34 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Hector Gonzalez. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CV)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Fri 04/04 9:30 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a letter no longer than three pages on or before April 24, 2025, describing Plaintiff's efforts to serve Plaintiff's complaint and a summons on Defendant. If Plaintiff fails to file the letter required by this order, or if Plaintiff's letter demonstrates a lack of diligence in attempting service, then the Court is unlikely to extend the deadline for Plaintiff to complete service under Rule 4(m) in the absence of unusual circumstances demonstrating good cause. The Court will not extend the deadline for Plaintiff to file the letter required by this order unless Plaintiff requests an extension in accordance with Section I.D of the Court's Individual Practices. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 4/4/2025. (RCM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/03 8:59 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Ajay Suresh (Kornhauser, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/03 8:58 PM
COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement - Injunctive Relief Demanded against Long Island University filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18920676 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Ajay Suresh. (Kornhauser, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Registration,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 AO 121 - Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright