Missouri Western District Court
Case #: 6:25-cr-03049
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 2:45 AM CDT
Defendant
Fidel Donahue Stevenson (1)
Represented By
Celeste Johns
Federal Public Defender'S Office - Springfield
contact info
Ian A. Lewis
Federal Public Defender'S Office - Springfield
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Cameron Alan Beaver
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/04/2025 4:08 AM CDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Fidel Donahue Stevenson (1). (Burch, Steve) [6:25-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A,
Att: 2 Attachment B
2 2 MOTION for detention hearing by USA as to Fidel Donahue Stevenson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/31/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Beaver, Cameron) [6:25-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David P. Rush: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Fidel Donahue Stevenson held on 3/18/2025. Time in court: 10:32 a.m. to 10:36 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Karla Berziel, 417-865-3869. DEFENDANT IN CUSTODY. (Berziel, Karla) [6:25-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORAL PRO SE MOTION to appoint counsel by Fidel Donahue Stevenson. (Berziel, Karla) [6:25-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER granting 4 pro se motion to appoint counsel. Ian A. Lewis, Assistant Federal Public Defender, for Fidel Donahue Stevenson appointed. (Berziel, Karla) [6:25-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Fidel Donahue Stevenson. This is the official notice for this hearing. Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing set for 3/21/2025 at 11:30 AM in MJ Courtroom, Springfield (DPR) before Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berziel, Karla) [6:25-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Celeste Johns appearing for Fidel Donahue Stevenson. (Attorney Celeste Johns added to party Fidel Donahue Stevenson(pty:dft))(Johns, Celeste) [6:25-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
9 9 BOND REPORT as to Fidel Donahue Stevenson. Document is available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter PACER login and password first for authentication. (Naumann, Brandy) [6:25-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David P. Rush: PRELIMINARY HEARING and DETENTION HEARING as to Fidel Donahue Stevenson held on 3/21/2025. Time in court: 11:13 a.m. to 11:16 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Karla Berziel, 417-865-3869. DEFENDANT IN CUSTODY. (Berziel, Karla) [6:25-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER as to Fidel Donahue Stevenson. (Berziel, Karla) [6:25-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
12 12 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Fidel Donahue Stevenson (1). (Berziel, Karla) [6:25-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
13 13 INDICTMENT as to Fidel Donahue Stevenson (1) count(s) 1. (Furtak, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
14 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. as to Fidel Donahue Stevenson. Signed on 4/2/2025 by District Judge Brian C Wimes.(Furtak, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER AUTHORIZING TEMPORARY TRANSFER OF CUSTODY ON CONSENT as to Fidel Donahue Stevenson. (Furtak, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE as to Fidel Donahue Stevenson. Case referral reassigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David P. Rush no longer assigned to case. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Furtak, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
17 17 NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING as to Fidel Donahue Stevenson. This is the official notice for this hearing. Arraignment and Initial Appearance set for 4/8/2025 10:15 AM in Video Conference - Springfield before Chief Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. Video Teleconference link will be provided to the parties by email. For the public or media to request court hearing audio access, please email jcgen@mow.uscourts.gov; any use of a recording device is strictly prohibited. Signed on 04/02/2025 by Chief Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
Related: [-]