California Northern District Court
Judge:Jon S Tigar
Case #: 4:25-cv-02926
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause09:1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 8:04 PM PDT
Petitioner
X CORP.
Represented By
Charles Harker Rhodes, IV
Clement & Murphy PLLC
contact info
Mitchell Keshava Pallaki
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Paul D. Clement
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Eric Meckley
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Respondent
Stanley Soo
Respondent
Prasida Menon
Respondent
Anca Mosoiu
Respondent
Lauren Nagra
Respondent
SoYoung Park
Respondent
Alisa Rangwala
Respondent
Ryan Riccetti
Respondent
Margaret Shi
Respondent
Travis McCleery
Respondent
Yoali Sotomayor Baqueiro
Respondent
Lauren Traylor
Respondent
Wutao Wei
Respondent
Benjamin Wheeler
Respondent
Adrian Yusi
Respondent
Heng Zhang
Respondent
Yiwei Zhuang
Respondent
John Li
Respondent
Sanjay Kapoor
Respondent
Lauren Itow
Respondent
Iris Hsieh
Respondent
Seung Heon Han
Respondent
Cheston Gunawan
Respondent
Lauren Fratamico
Respondent
Craig Filamor
Respondent
Jiahui Ding
Respondent
Stephanie Cheng
Respondent
Chen Chen
Respondent
Wing Kai Chan
Respondent
Lauren Bose
Respondent
Sagar Bonde
Respondent
Aline Bandak
Respondent
Alexander Adusei


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
22 22 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 04/23 11:13 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by X CORP.. Service waived by Alexander Adusei waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Aline Bandak waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Sagar Bonde waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Lauren Bose waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Wing Kai Chan waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Chen Chen waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Stephanie Cheng waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Jiahui Ding waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Craig Filamor waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Lauren Fratamico waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Cheston Gunawan waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Seung Heon Han waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Iris Hsieh waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Lauren Itow waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Sanjay Kapoor waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; John Li waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Travis McCleery waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Prasida Menon waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Anca Mosoiu waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Lauren Nagra waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; SoYoung Park waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Alisa Rangwala waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Ryan Riccetti waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Margaret Shi waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Stanley Soo waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Yoali Sotomayor Baqueiro waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Lauren Traylor waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Wutao Wei waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Benjamin Wheeler waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Adrian Yusi waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Heng Zhang waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Yiwei Zhuang waiver sent on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025. (Meckley, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
21 21 5 pgs order Order Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Fri 04/18 3:04 PM
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PETITIONER'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar re 20 STIPULATION. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 19 Amended MOTION to Compel Arbitration . Responses due by 5/30/2025. Reply due by 6/20/2025. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2025 at 02:00 PM - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 07/30/2025 at 2:00PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
20 20 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 04/17 1:14 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PETITIONER'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION filed by Craig Filamor, Lauren Fratamico, Cheston Gunawan, Seung Heon Han, Iris Hsieh, Lauren Itow, Sanjay Kapoor, John Li, Travis McCleery, Anca Mosoiu, Lauren Nagra, SoYoung Park, Alisa Rangwala, Ryan Riccetti, Stanley Soo, Margaret Shi, Yoali Sotomayor Baqueiro, Lauren Traylor, Wutao Wei, Benjamin Wheeler, Alexander Adusei, Adrian Yusi, Heng Zhang, Yiwei Zhuang, Prasida Menon, Aline Bandak, Sagar Bonde, Lauren Bose, Wing Kai Chan, Chen Chen, Stephanie Cheng, Jiahui Ding. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
19 19 motion Compel Fri 04/04 4:58 PM
Amended MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by X CORP.. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2025 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 4/18/2025. Replies due by 4/25/2025.(Clement, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Adam Mehes,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
18 18 motion Compel Fri 04/04 3:21 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by X CORP.. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2025 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 4/18/2025. Replies due by 4/25/2025.(Clement, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Adam Mehes,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
17 17 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 04/04 9:27 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by X CORP. identifying Corporate Parent X HOLDINGS CORP., Corporate Parent X.AI HOLDINGS CORP. for X CORP.. (Clement, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Thu 04/03 3:20 PM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ZOOM HEARING. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/24/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2025 at 02:00 PM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 06/30/2025 at 2:00PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/03 2:37 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Thu 04/03 1:00 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bxl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 04/03 7:50 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by X CORP... (Clement, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
12 12 Summons Issued as to Alexander Adusei, Aline Bandak, Sagar Bonde, Lauren Bose, Wing Kai Chan, Chen Chen, Stephanie Cheng, Jiahui Ding, Craig Filamor, Lauren Fratamico, Cheston Gunawan, Seung Heon Han, Iris Hsieh, Lauren Itow, Sanjay Kapoor, John Li, Travis McCleery, Prasida Menon, Anca Mosoiu, Lauren Nagra, SoYoung Park, Alisa Rangwala, Ryan Riccetti, Margaret Shi, Stanley Soo, Yoali Sotomayor Baqueiro, Lauren Traylor, Wutao Wei, Benjamin Wheeler, Adrian Yusi, Heng Zhang, Yiwei Zhuang. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
11 11 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/23/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2025 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
10 10 Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/14/2025. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 Civil Cover Sheet by X CORP. . (Meckley, Eric)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20511339.) filed by X CORP.. (Pallaki, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20511334.) filed by X CORP.. (Rhodes, Charles)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20511278.) filed by X CORP.. (Clement, Paul)
Related: [-]
[LINK:Electronic filing error] .Use Current Civil Cover Sheet, www.cand.uscourts.gov. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re:1 Petition to Compel Arbitration,, filed by X CORP. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Meckley, Eric)
Related: [-]
1 1 PETITION to Compel Arbitration against Alexander Adusei, Aline Bandak, Sagar Bonde, Lauren Bose, Wing Kai Chan, Chen Chen, Stephanie Cheng, Jiahui Ding, Craig Filamor, Lauren Fratamico, Cheston Gunawan, Seung Heon Han, Iris Hsieh, Lauren Itow, Sanjay Kapoor, John Li, Travis McCleery, Prasida Menon, Anca Mosoiu, Lauren Nagra, SoYoung Park, Alisa Rangwala, Ryan Riccetti, Margaret Shi, Stanley Soo, Yoali Sotomayor Baqueiro, Lauren Traylor, Wutao Wei, Benjamin Wheeler, Adrian Yusi, Heng Zhang, Yiwei Zhuang (filing fee $402, receipt number ACANDC-20510093). Filed by X CORP..(Meckley, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to 5,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet