Utah District Court
Judge:David Nuffer
Referred: Paul Kohler
Case #: 4:25-cv-00037
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Case in other court:Fifth Judicial District Court of Washington County, 250500230
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 2:09 PM MDT
Defendant
Progressive Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael J. Collins
Jones Skelton & Hochuli PLC
contact info
Branigan Monty Satterfield
Jones Skelton & Hochuli PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rosemary Alvarez
Represented By
Jaren Charles Sandberg
Park Todd PLLC
contact info
Tyler T. Todd
Park Todd PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
9 9 misc Received Consent /Reassignment Form Wed 04/09 1:11 PM
RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Defendant Progressive Preferred Insurance Company. (mh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/08 9:41 AM
ORDER Supplementing 7 Order to Propose Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 4/8/25 (alt)
Related: [-]
7 7 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Tue 04/08 9:40 AM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 4/8/25 (alt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/07 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Location: This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's[LINK:Southern Region web page.] (bmr)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 04/07 1:55 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 04/07/2025. (bmr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Availability of Judicial Settlement Conference Fri 04/04 1:22 PM
NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form[LINK:motion] is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Rosemary Alvarez, Defendant Progressive Preferred Insurance Company. (kec)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Fri 04/04 1:21 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-3, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff Rosemary Alvarez, Defendant Progressive Preferred Insurance Company. (Notice generated by Clerk's office) Form due by 4/25/2025. (kec)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice From the Court Fri 04/04 1:17 PM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT re1 Notice of Removal. Attorney selected the incorrect division when creating the case. Case 2:25-cv-00265 will be closed and all pleadings will be transferred to case 4:25-cv-00037. Case number will now read 4:25-cv-00037. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Atty) Fri 04/04 12:46 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 5th District Court, case number 250500230, (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5385445) filed by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company. (Collins, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit complaint and summons,
Att: 2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 04/04 1:20 PM
Judge David Nuffer added. Case number will now read 4:25-cv-00037-DN. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec)
Related: [-]