California Central District Court
Judge:Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:25-cv-02950
Nature of Suit385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability
Cause28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 25SMCV00382
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 4:08 PM PDT
Defendant
Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By
Austin F Smith
Haight Brown And Bonsteel LLP
contact info
Defendant
Resideo Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Austin F Smith
Haight Brown And Bonsteel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Travelers Commercial Insurance Company


Docket last updated: 04/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
9 9 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 04/09 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants Honeywell International Inc., Resideo Technologies, Inc., identifying Travelers Commerical Insurance Company; Benjamin Keywanfar; Resideo Technologies, Inc.; BlackRock Fund Advisors; The Vanguard Group, Inc.; Honeywell International Inc.. (Smith, Austin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
8 8 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 04/07 2:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Honeywell International Inc., Resideo Technologies, Inc.. (Smith, Austin)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Mon 04/07 12:48 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Mon 04/07 12:40 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
5 5 trial Jury Demand Fri 04/04 12:25 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by defendants Honeywell International Inc., Resideo Technologies, Inc... (Smith, Austin)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/04 12:21 PM
Notice of Related Cases filed by defendants Honeywell International Inc., Resideo Technologies, Inc.. (Smith, Austin)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/04 12:15 PM
Notice of Filing Answer in State Court filed by defendants Honeywell International Inc., Resideo Technologies, Inc..(Smith, Austin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
2 2 misc Declaration Fri 04/04 12:08 PM
DECLARATION of Austin Smith re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 In Support of Removal filed by Defendants Honeywell International Inc., Resideo Technologies, Inc..(Smith, Austin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/04 12:00 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 25SMCV00382 Receipt No: ACACDC-39445607 - Fee: $405, filed by defendants Honeywell International Inc., Resideo Technologies, Inc.. (Attorney Austin F Smith added to party Honeywell International Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Austin F Smith added to party Resideo Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Smith, Austin)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 04/07 12:44 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Honeywell International Inc., Resideo Technologies, Inc., filed by Plaintiff Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/23/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 04/07 12:46 PM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendants Honeywell International Inc., Resideo Technologies, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 )(lh)
Related: [-]