California Central District Court
Judge:Anne Hwang
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:25-cv-02971
Nature of Suit720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 25STCV04896
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 4:13 PM PDT
Defendant
Paragon Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Jasmine R. Kiaei
Fisher And Phillips
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Tapia


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 04/14 5:11 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Anne Hwang. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and differs in some respects from the Local Rules. See order for details. (ys)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 04/14 10:32 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Mon 04/14 10:31 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero to Judge Anne Hwang for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:25-cv-02971-AH (MARx). (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 textonly MJDAP Timely Opt-Out Mon 04/14 10:10 AM
Declination of Consent form received on 4/11/2025 was submitted within deadline set forth in L.R. 73-2.1. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
5 5 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Tue 04/08 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 04/04 3:52 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Paragon Systems, Inc., (Kiaei, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/04 3:49 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Paragon Systems, Inc. (Kiaei, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 04/04 3:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Paragon Systems, Inc.. (Kiaei, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/04 3:46 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 25STCV04896 Receipt No: ACACDC-39448484 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Paragon Systems, Inc.. (Attorney Jasmine R. Kiaei added to party Paragon Systems, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kiaei, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Frank Magnanimo w-Exhibits,
Att: 2 Declaration of Laura Hagan w-Exhibit
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 04/08 3:54 PM
CONFORMED COPY COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Steven Tapia in Los Angeles Superior Court on 2/20/2025, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 04/08 3:56 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Paragon Systems, Inc. in Los Angeles Superior Court on 4/3/2025, attached as Exhibit C. (jtil)
Related: [-]