Utah District Court
Judge:Daphne A Oberg
Case #: 2:25-cv-00269
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 3:24 AM MDT
Defendant
Travelers Personal Insurance Company
ONe Tower Square
Hartford, CT 06183
Plaintiff
Mr. Aaron Ravonsheed
Represented By
Brennan H. Moss
Parkinson Benson Potter
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
5 5 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Wed 04/09 1:03 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 4/9/2025. (alf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
4 4 misc Modification of Docket Tue 04/08 1:29 PM
Modification of Docket: Error: Complaint was filed against plaintiff instead of defendant. Correction: Docket text now reflects the complaint and is filed against the defendant; answer records corrected re1 Complaint. (kec)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Electronically Mon 04/07 2:30 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Travelers Personal Insurance Company. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 04/07 8:17 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re1 Complaint. The Civil Cover Sheet is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a complete Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule DUCivR3-4. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet JS44 immediately. (kec)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/07 8:16 AM
Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg added. Case number will now read 2:25-cv-00269-DAO. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint (Atty) Fri 04/04 8:56 PM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5385965) filed by Aaron Ravonsheed. (Moss, Brennan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Policy