Washington Western District Court
Judge:Barbara J Rothstein
Case #: 2:25-cv-00601
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 1:48 AM PDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Defendant
TD Bank USA NA
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank NA
Plaintiff
Omar Abdi
Represented By
Craig B Sanders
Sanders Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 04, 2025
3 3 misc BJR Standing Order (FORM) Fri 04/04 12:08 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. (NAW)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 04/04 10:10 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Equifax Information Services LLC, TD Bank USA NA, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (MW)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to Filer Fri 04/04 10:08 AM
NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 3:25-cv-5283 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Seattle case number. All future filings shall bear the following case number and Judge assignment: 2:25-cv-601-BJR. Before initiating a new case, please review the[LINK:Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF)] to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (MW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Equifax Information Services, LLC, TD Bank USA, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. with JURY DEMAND Related [+] Attorney Craig B Sanders added to party Omar Abdi(pty:pla) filed by Omar Abdi.(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8912782
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons as to Equifax Information Services, LLC,
Att: 3 Summons as to TD Bank USA, N.A.,
Att: 4 Summons as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.