Washington Western District Court
Judge:David W Christel
Case #: 3:25-cv-05287
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 1:48 AM PDT
Defendant
Fashion Nova LLC
Plaintiff
Brianna Clark
Represented By
Jonas Bram Jacobson
Dovel & Luner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Selena Flores
Represented By
Jonas Bram Jacobson
Dovel & Luner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenita Hearne
Represented By
Jonas Bram Jacobson
Dovel & Luner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Evelyn Hernandez
Represented By
Jonas Bram Jacobson
Dovel & Luner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Aliz Holly
Represented By
Jonas Bram Jacobson
Dovel & Luner LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
4 4 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Fri 04/11 3:42 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Fashion Nova, LLC on 4/11/2025, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Jacobson, Jonas)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 04/04 10:19 AM
Summons Electronically Issued as to Defendant Fashion Nova LLC (MIH)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to Filer Fri 04/04 10:10 AM
NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 2:25-cv-00589 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Tacoma case number. All future filings shall bear the following case number and Judge assignment: 3:25-cv-05287-DWC . Before initiating a new case, please review the[LINK:Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF)] to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (MIH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
2 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:23-cv-00408, by All Plaintiffs. (Jacobson, Jonas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
1 1 37 pgs COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Fashion Nova LLC with JURY DEMAND Related [+] Attorney Jonas Bram Jacobson added to party Evelyn Hernandez (pty:pla) filed by Evelyn Hernandez.(Jacobson, Jonas)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8912623
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons