Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Jeremy D Kernodle
Case #: 4:25-cv-00357
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 10:07 AM CDT
Defendant
EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
Online Information Services, Inc.
Defendant
ProCollect, Inc.
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC.
Defendant
Transworld Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff
Amelia Villalobos
Represented By
Kyle Kaufman
Raburn Kaufman, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/15 10:19 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amelia Villalobos. Trans Union, LLC waiver sent on 4/9/2025, answer due 6/9/2025. (Kaufman, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/07 9:23 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10767235.), filed by Amelia Villalobos.(Kaufman, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/07 10:49 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. (jmb)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 04/07 10:49 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (jmb)
Related: [-]