Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:25-cv-00340
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 10:07 AM CDT
Defendant
Wendy's International, LLC
Plaintiff
S3G Technology LLC
Represented By
Charles Ainsworth
Parker Bunt & Ainsworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
8 8 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 04/10 10:56 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Wendy's International, LLC answer is now due 6/12/2025. (Text entry only, no document attached.)(slo)
Related: [-]
7 7 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 04/10 10:26 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by S3G Technology LLC. Summons originally served on 04/07/2025. Agreed new answer date is 06/12/2025.(Ainsworth, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/08 10:05 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by S3G Technology LLC. Wendy's International, LLC served on 4/7/2025. (Ainsworth, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 04/07 9:53 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Wendy's International, LLC. (KLC)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 04/07 9:43 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by S3G Technology LLC (Ainsworth, Charles)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 04/07 9:41 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 04/07 9:40 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document:1 Complaint,. Civil Cover Sheet . (Ainsworth, Charles)
Related: [-]
1 1 42 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/07 9:33 AM
COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Wendy's International, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10767274.), filed by S3G Technology LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/07 9:46 AM
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne added. (KLC)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 04/07 9:46 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (KLC)
Related: [-]