New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela K Chen
Case #: 1:25-cv-01888
Nature of Suit462 Immigration - Naturalization Application
Cause18:4208(B) Agency Action Review
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 1:06 PM EDT
Defendant
Michael Borgen
Defendant
Kika Scott
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services 111 Massachusetts Ave NW
Washington, DC 20529
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff
Shengfan Yang
Represented By
Theodore N Cox
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
9 9 notice Notice(Other) Fri 04/11 2:34 PM
NOTICE by Shengfan Yang re1 Complaint, Notice of Filing Omitted Exhibits (O'Donnell, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/11 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Neil T. O'Donnell on behalf of Shengfan Yang (notification declined or already on case) (O'Donnell, Neil)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice(Other) Fri 04/11 1:30 PM
NOTICE by Shengfan Yang re5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-18933791 of Filing Affidavit of Neil T. O'Donnell (O'Donnell, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/11 1:46 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to counsel Neil T. O'Donnell: The attorney shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance to ensure electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $200 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 4/11/2025. (FG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause (Federal) Thu 04/10 8:46 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The United States Attorney, as attorney for Defendants, is directed to show cause on or before 6/16/2025, in writing, why a writ of mandamus should not be issued, and shall serve a copy of the response on Plaintiff, with proof of such service to the Clerk of this Court. On or before 7/16/2025, Plaintiff shall file a reply, if any, with proof of service to the Clerk of Court. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 4/10/2025. Electronic Service upon the US Attorneys Office re1 Complaint. (FG)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/10 8:32 PM
ORDER deferring ruling on5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The Court defers ruling on the Pro Hac Vice application until such time that counsel resubmits his declaration, which should be notarized. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 4/10/2025. (FG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/09 12:44 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-18933791 by Shengfan Yang. (O'Donnell, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/08 10:16 AM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Shengfan Yang (Cox, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 04/07 3:21 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/7/2025) (CV)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued as to USA Mon 04/07 3:15 PM
Summons Issued as to Michael Borgen, Kika Scott, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (CV)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/07 1:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Michael Borgen, Kika Scott, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18926745 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Shengfan Yang. (Cox, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/07 12:46 PM
NOTICE: INCOMPLETE INITIAL CASE OPENING DOCUMENT SUBMISSION. Please file the Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Proposed Summons and pay the Civil Filing Fee for the following case so that it may be processed. Initial Case Opening Documents Should be Filed at The Time a Case Number is generated! (CV)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/07 3:12 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CV)
Related: [-]