District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Timothy J Kelly
Case #: 1:25-cv-01034
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of the District of Columbia, 2025-CAB-001389
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 2:06 PM EDT
Defendant
NATIONAL LINKS TRUST
Represented By
Bernard G. Dennis, III
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
VERNEL DUVALL


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
6 6 motion Dismiss Mon 04/14 3:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint in Its Entirety by NATIONAL LINKS TRUST.(Dennis, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, April 10, 2025
5 5 misc Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents Thu 04/10 2:46 PM
Receipt on 4/10/2025 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2025-CAB-001389. (zdp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
4 4 order Standing Order Mon 04/07 4:52 PM
STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/7/2025. (lctjk1)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel/Party Mon 04/07 4:28 PM
NOTICE to Counsel/Party re1 Notice of Removal,(zmtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/07 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E. Kreiser on behalf of NATIONAL LINKS TRUST (Kreiser, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 04/07 1:59 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2025-CAB-001389 Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADCDC-11595446 filed by NATIONAL LINKS TRUST.(Dennis, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/07 4:24 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmtm)
Related: [-]