American Tradition Institute et al v. Joshua (I) Epel, et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | William J Martinez |
Referred: | Boyd N Boland |
Case #: | 1:11-cv-00859 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s) |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2011 |
Terminated: | May 12, 2014 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 15, 2015 10:33 AM MDT |
Defendant
Joshua Epel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pamela Patton
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Tarpey
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Sierra Club
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Solar Energy Inustries Association
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Wilderness Society, The
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Interwest Energy Alliance
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Environment Colorado
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Conservation Colorado Education Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rod Lueck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Energy & Environment Legal Institute
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
James (I) Tarpey
Terminated: 08/22/2012
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Barbara J. Kelley
Terminated: 07/17/2012
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John (I) Hickenlooper
Terminated: 07/17/2012
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Hickenlooper
Terminated: 07/17/2012
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joshua (I) Epel
Terminated: 08/22/2012
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Barbara (I) J. Kelley
Terminated: 07/17/2012
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Doug (I) Dean
Terminated: 08/22/2012
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Doug Dean
Terminated: 08/22/2012
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ron (I) Binz
Terminated: 05/16/2011
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ron Binz
Terminated: 05/16/2011
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Matt (I) Baker
Terminated: 08/22/2012
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Matt Baker
Terminated: 08/22/2012
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
State of Colorado, The
Terminated: 07/17/2012
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Colorado Environmental Coalition
Terminated: 04/05/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
American Tradition Partnership
Terminated: 12/11/2012
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
American Tradition Institute
Terminated: 12/02/2013
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Intermountain Rural Electric Association
Terminated: 06/24/2013
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/04/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Monday, December 07, 2015 | ||
252 | 252
appeal
Letter re Writ of Certiorari
Mon 12/07 2:36 PM
Letter from U.S. Supreme Court regarding Petition for Writ of Certiorari re228 Notice of Appeal ; assigned Supreme Court No. 15-471 ( Appeal No. 14-1216 The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. (cthom, ) |