Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Aileen M Cannon
Case #: 2:25-cv-14109
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 5:09 PM EDT
Defendant
Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Plaintiff
Stevie Dolson
Represented By
Andrew Ross Frisch
Morgan & Morgan
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
7 7 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 04/11 4:04 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: This FLSA matter has been referred to me to conduct a settlement conference6 . To facilitate matters, by Wednesday, April 16, 2025, counsel shall confer and file a joint motion with at least four proposed settlement conference dates that fall within the 28-day period after Defendant's expected filing of a response to Plaintiff's statement of claim. I will thereafter issue an order setting forth the date, time, place, and procedures for the settlement conference. For planning purposes, the settlement conference will be held virtually via Zoom and my general preference is to hold such conferences on Tuesdays and Thursdays when I do not have regularly scheduled criminal duty court. In addition, a representative with full settlement authority for each party must be available to participate in the conference. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek Mills Maynard on 4/11/2025. (jd02)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
6 6 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 04/10 11:17 AM
ORDER IN ACTIONS BROUGHT UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT, REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek Mills Maynard for Settlement. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 4/10/2025. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 04/08 8:31 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES ON SEALING/REDACTION: Notwithstanding the requirements of Local Rule 5.4 and/or any protective order, the parties are prohibited from filing anything under seal or from redacting any content from a court filing or exhibit/attachment (except for the personal data identifiers listed in Section 6A of this District's CM/ECF Administrative Procedures) unless the party with a stated interest in sealing/redaction first seeks and obtains permission from the Court via a motion for leave. The motion for leave must be filed after meaningful conferral with the opposing party (or parties) and be filed publicly except as authorized by prior Court order. Additionally, the motion for leave shall specify the particularized basis for sealing the proposed material; shall describe the information/documents to be sealed with as much specificity as possible but without attaching the proposed sealed material; shall indicate the proposed duration of the seal request and the reasons why means other than sealing are unavailable or unsatisfactory; shall contain a separate certificate of conference section indicating the results of the parties' meaningful conferral; and shall be filed at last three business days before any related deadline to permit adequate Court consideration. The party seeking authorization to seal material shall not file or otherwise attach the subject material until the Court has ruled on the motion for leave. Finally, all parties are advised that mere designation of material as confidential and/or otherwise subject to a protective order does not bind the Court, does not supplant the requirements of the Local Rules on sealing, and does not otherwise relieve the party seeking sealing/redaction from justifying its request under applicable legal principals governing the presumption of public access to civil proceedings. Failure to comply with this Notice may result in immediate unsealing of any unauthorized shielded material. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 4/8/2025. (jj01)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Bar Letter Tue 04/08 2:01 PM
Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Jolie Pavlos, mailing date April 8, 2025, (pt)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 04/08 8:10 AM
Summons Issued as to Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (cds)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 04/08 8:08 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cds)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/07 4:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Publix Super Markets, Inc.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18346917, filed by Stevie Dolson.(Frisch, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s) as to Publix Super Markets, Inc.