Washington Western District Court
Judge:Marsha J Pechman
Case #: 2:25-cv-00616
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Case in other court:King County Superior Court, 25-00002-08131-1-SEA
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 2:12 PM PDT
Defendant
ACV Auctions Inc.
Represented By
Kyle Nelson
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
Emily A Bushaw
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
Defendant
ACV Capital LLC
Represented By
Kyle Nelson
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
Defendant
ACV Transportation LLC
Represented By
Kyle Nelson
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
Emily A Bushaw
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Hill
Represented By
Hannah Margaret Hamley
Emery Reddy PLLC
contact info
Timothy W Emery
Emery Reddy PLLC
contact info
Patrick B. Reddy
Emery Reddy PLLC
contact info
Paul Cipriani, Jr
Emery Reddy PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/14 3:54 PM
ANSWER to Complaint; by ACV Auctions Inc, ACV Capital LLC, ACV Transportation LLC.(Nelson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
8 8 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Tue 04/08 12:31 PM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted federal court jury demand on file (HH)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 04/08 12:17 PM
Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (HH)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
7 7 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 04/07 2:58 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent ACV Auctions Inc. for ACV Auctions Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by All Defendants. (Nelson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Jury Demand Mon 04/07 2:48 PM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Jeffrey Hill (Emery, Timothy)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Declaration (non motion) Mon 04/07 2:39 PM
DECLARATION of Stephanie Laquitara re1 Notice of Removal, by All Defendants (Nelson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Declaration (non motion) Mon 04/07 2:38 PM
DECLARATION of Lacey Duemmer re1 Notice of Removal, by All Defendants (Nelson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Verification of State Court Records Mon 04/07 2:36 PM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re1 Notice of Removal, DECLARATION OF EMILY A. BUSHAW IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants(Nelson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-I
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/07 2:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by All Defendants. (Nelson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 04/07 2:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 25 2-08131 1 SEA; Related [+] Attorney Kyle Nelson added to party ACV Capital LLC(pty:dft) filed by ACV Capital LLC, ACV Auctions Inc., ACV Transportation LLC.(Nelson, Kyle)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8918177
Att: 1 15 pgs Complaint