New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Peggy Kuo
Case #: 1:25-cv-01901
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 6:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Wei Guang Huang
Defendant
Shing Fat Store Inc (DBA 99 Cent NYC)
Plaintiff
Jose Bautista


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
7 7 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/08 10:01 AM
ORDER IN FLSA CASE REQUIRING DISCOVERY AND SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL DISCOVERY AND MEDIATION SCHEDULE: The parties are ordered to engage in discovery as outlined in the attached Order, and to engage in early settlement discussions. A joint status report regarding settlement efforts must be filed by October 7, 2025. If the parties are unable to settle on their own, the case will be referred to EDNY Court-Annexed Mediation for formal mediation. The parties may move to waive these requirements and permit the parties to proceed by way of a Proposed Discovery Plan only for good cause, by filing a joint letter request on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/8/2025. (RO)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 04/08 9:31 AM
Summons Issued as to Wei Guang Huang, Shing Fat Store Inc.. (KD)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 04/08 9:15 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. Corrections have been made. Please refer to ALL Corrections made on this case, SPECIFICALLY THE OTHER SECTION ON THIS FORM! (KD)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Tue 04/08 9:14 AM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (KD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/08 9:11 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/07 6:49 PM
Proposed Summons. by Jose Bautista (Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/07 6:44 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Jose Bautista (Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/07 6:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Jose Bautista filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18929423 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Jose Bautista. (Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]