Washington Western District Court
Judge:Lauren King
Case #: 2:25-cv-00618
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 4:07 PM PDT
Defendant
OBI Seafoods, LLC
Plaintiff
Tara Hamlin
Represented By
Kaleigh Boyd
Tousley Brain Stephens PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Related Case Mon 04/14 5:30 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:25-cv-00588-SKV, by Plaintiff Tara Hamlin. (Boyd, Kaleigh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
5 5 order LK Standing Order for All Civil Cases (FORM) Wed 04/09 10:03 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Standing Order
4 4 order LK Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Wed 04/09 10:00 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
3 3 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Tue 04/08 2:09 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Notice of Related Cases Omitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 4/14/2025. (HH)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 04/08 2:08 PM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) OBI Seafoods LLC (HH)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 04/08 2:02 PM
Judge Lauren King added. (HH)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
1 1 53 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/07 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) OBI Seafoods, LLC with JURY DEMAND Related [+] filed by Tara Hamlin.(Boyd, Kaleigh)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8918535
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons