Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Marcia Morales Howard
Referred: Laura Lothman Lambert
Case #: 3:25-cv-00350
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Case in other court:Florida Northern, 3:25-cv-00273
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 08, 2025 4:19 AM EDT
Defendant
Officers
Plaintiff
Kareem S Grady
A-130215 OKALOOSA CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION 3189 COLONEL GREG MALLOY ROAD
CRESTVIEW, FL 32539


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/23 9:26 AM
ORDER granting 2 plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and assessing the $350 filing fee; directions to the clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 4/23/2025. (CAW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
6 6 order Standing Order - Pro Se Litigants Tue 04/08 2:01 PM
NOTICE to pro se litigant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 4/8/2025. (CAW)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
5 5 transfer Case transferred in - district transfer Mon 04/07 2:41 PM
Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 3:25-cv-00273. File received electronically
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
4 4 ORDER. the Clerk of Court TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida and close the file in this Court fifteen days from the date of this Order, unless the Clerk receives an objection from the Plaintiff prior to the expiration of the fifteen-day deadline. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 03/19/2025. (Deadline to transfer if no objections filed - 4/3/2025 .) (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 4/7/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
3 3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 4/7/2025.]
Related: [-]
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re:1 Complaint,2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to ZACHARY C BOLITHO. (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 4/7/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
2 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by KAREEM S GRADY. (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 4/7/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against OFFICERS, filed by OFFICERS. (1 service copy) (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 4/7/2025.]
Related: [-]