California Central District Court
Judge:Michelle Williams Court
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:25-cv-03019
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 08, 2025 1:14 AM PDT
Defendant
United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Plaintiff
Ifeoma Chukwurah
1968 South Coast Highway, Ste 4064
Laguna Beach, CA 92651


Docket last updated: 04/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
15 15 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 04/08 7:45 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Michelle Williams Court. (ji)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
14 14 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 04/07 5:31 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
13 13 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 04/07 5:30 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 04/07 5:29 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michelle Williams Court and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (sh)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 06, 2025
11 11 motion Order Mon 04/07 5:28 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Approval of Fee Waiver, Immediate Issuance of Summons, Permission to Serve Defendant via Email, Equitable Accommodation Under ADA Title II and 504 filed by Plaintiff Ifeoma Chukwurah. (sh)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Related Case(s) Mon 04/07 5:25 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Ifeoma Chukwurah. Related Case(s): 8:25-cv-00438-SRM-JDE, 2:25-cv-02371-JFW-JPR, 2:25-cv-02982-AB (MARx) (sh)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 Mon 04/07 5:23 PM
APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Ifeoma Chukwurah. (sh)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Summons Request Mon 04/07 5:22 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery),1 filed by Plaintiff Ifeoma Chukwurah. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Summons Request Mon 04/07 5:21 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery),1 filed by Plaintiff Ifeoma Chukwurah. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Summons Request Mon 04/07 5:20 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery),1 filed by Plaintiff Ifeoma Chukwurah. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Mon 04/07 5:19 PM
SEALED REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Ifeoma Chukwurah. (sh)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Mon 04/07 5:18 PM
[REDACTED] REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Ifeoma Chukwurah. (sh)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Leave to File Document Mon 04/07 5:15 PM
MOTION TO FILE FEE WAIVER UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiff Ifeoma Chukwurah. (sh)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 04/07 5:02 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ifeoma Chukwurah, (sh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 04/07 5:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Defendant United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.Case assigned to Judge Michelle Williams Court for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero., filed by Plaintiff Ifeoma Chukwurah. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet