New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Taryn A Merkl
Case #: 1:25-cv-01913
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 08, 2025 1:08 PM EDT
Plaintiff
Xinjie Wei


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/14 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Artemis Lekakis on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Lekakis, Artemis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 04/09 9:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Pam Bondi, Brian J Meier, Kristi Noem, Terri Robinson, Kika Scott, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (KD)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 04/09 9:42 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Wed 04/09 9:42 AM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (KD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/09 9:41 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/08 1:46 PM
Proposed Summons. by Xinjie Wei (Wasserman, Jed)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/08 1:34 PM
COMPLAINT FOR MANDAMUS against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), Pam Bondi, Kristi Noem, Kika Scott, Terri Robinson, Brian J Meier filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18931405 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Xinjie Wei. (Wasserman, Jed)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet