New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Natasha C Merle
Referred: Joseph A Marutollo
Case #: 1:25-cv-01923
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 08, 2025 4:05 PM EDT
Defendant
Impact Equities 1, LLC
Plaintiff
Lucca Carmignani
Represented By
Russell Evan Adler
Law Offices Of Russell E. Adler PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
7 7 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/09 12:17 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held on June 11, 2025 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. To participate in the conference, the parties shall dial (646) 828-7666; Meeting ID: 160 3637 2020; Passcode: 861287. The parties must complete the attached proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order and file it on ECF no later than June 6, 2025. Plaintiff is directed to ensure that all Defendants are aware of this conference. Counsel with knowledge of the case must attend the conference; per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. The parties are directed to review this Court's Individual Practices and Rules in advance of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/9/2025. (EG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Individual Practices and Rules
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 04/09 9:53 AM
Summons Issued as to Impact Equities 1, LLC. (KD)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 04/09 9:49 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 04/09 9:49 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (KD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/09 9:48 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Natasha C. Merle and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/08 4:02 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Lucca Carmignani (Adler, Russell)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/08 4:02 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Lucca Carmignani (Adler, Russell)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/08 4:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Impact Equities 1, LLC filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18932743 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Lucca Carmignani. (Adler, Russell)
Related: [-]