New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Orelia E Merchant
Referred: Joseph A Marutollo
Case #: 1:25-cv-01938
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 08, 2025 6:06 PM EDT
Defendant
Queens Autoland LLC
Plaintiff
Autoexpo Ent. Inc.


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Report Patent or Trademark AO120 Mon 04/14 4:04 PM
Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (RC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 complaint,
Att: 2 exhibit A,
Att: 3 exhibit B
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
5 5 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/09 1:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held on June 13, 2025 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 324 North before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. The parties must complete the attached proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order and file it on ECF no later than June 6, 2025. Plaintiff is directed to ensure that all Defendants are aware of this conference. Counsel with knowledge of the case must attend the conference; per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. The parties are directed to review this Court's Individual Practices and Rules in advance of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/9/2025. (EG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Individual Practices and Rules
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 04/09 12:20 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 04/09 12:20 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SDM)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 04/09 12:19 PM
Summons Issued as to Queens Autoland LLC. (SDM)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/09 12:16 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Orelia E. Merchant and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/08 6:13 PM
COMPLAINT by AutoExpo Ent. Inc. against Queens Autoland LLC filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18933554 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Autoexpo Ent. Inc.. (Greenbaum, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B