New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela K Chen
Referred: James M Wicks
Case #: 2:25-cv-01915
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
5 5 notice Notice to Pay Civil Filing Fee - Prisoner Case Thu 04/10 2:49 PM
Notice to Pay Civil Filing Fee - Prisoner Case as to Marion Maupin 628903. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (as amended July 26, 1996), plaintiff/petitioner is proceeding in forma pauperis and must pay the total $350 fee by monthly installments deducted from plaintiffs/petitioners prison trust fund account (or institutional equivalent). Original letter sent to the Warden/Superintendent of Correctional Facility.. (MLR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment of dkt. entry 3
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 04/09 9:49 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or non jury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (KS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
3 3 misc Prisoner Authorization Wed 04/09 9:48 AM
Prisoner Authorization (KS)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/09 9:44 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marion Maupin. (KS)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/09 9:24 AM
COMPLAINT against County of Suffolk, New York State Board of Parole, PO. V. Smith, PO. gray, PRS J. Rivera, Parole Office 550 Johnson Ave. Bohemia, NY, 11716 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Marion Maupin. (KS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet