Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Darrin P Gayles
Case #: 1:25-cv-21621
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 11:06 AM EDT
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff
Daniel W. Allison
Represented By
Alexander Arthur Palamara
Attorneys Dell & Schaefer Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Fri 04/11 3:01 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Daniel W. Allison. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 4/11/2025, response/answer due 5/2/2025. (Palamara, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
4 4 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Wed 04/09 4:24 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 4/9/2025. (hs01)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 04/09 3:57 PM
Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (nan)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 04/09 3:55 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/09 10:39 AM
COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18352393, filed by Daniel W. Allison.(Palamara, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summon(s)