Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:23-bk-04251

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Roberta A Colton
Case #: 8:25-ap-00130
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
R&S Solutions, LLC
96 American Drive
Jackson, TN 38301
Represented By
R&S Solutions, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Legacy-Xspire Holdings, LLC
Shumaker Loop Kendrick 101 E. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 2800
Tampa, FL 33602
Represented By
Steven M Berman
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Wraser, LLC
Represented By
Steven M Berman
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Xspire Pharma, LLC
Represented By
Steven M Berman
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Mon 04/14 2:54 PM
Service Executed on R & S Solutions, LLC of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Steven M Berman on behalf of Plaintiffs Legacy-Xspire Holdings, LLC, Wraser, LLC, Xspire Pharma, LLC Related [+]. (Berman, Steven)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Wed 04/09 11:56 AM
Summons issued on R and S Solutions along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 05/09/2025. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
1 1 6 pgs cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Tue 04/08 2:09 PM
Complaint by Legacy-Xspire Holdings, LLC, et al. against R&S Solutions. Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: [12 Related [+]]. (Berman, Steven)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit