California Northern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey S White
Case #: 4:25-cv-03180
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 11:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Window Innovations Inc.
Plaintiff
Jeenah Moon
Represented By
Craig B. Sanders
Sanders Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Fri 04/11 10:31 AM
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/11/2025. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2025. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsw General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (nmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 04/10 4:10 PM
Summons Issued as to Window Innovations Inc. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 04/10 4:06 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/4/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2025 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, via Videoconference Only. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.(slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Thu 04/10 4:12 PM
Copy of3 Report emailed to Copyright office (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 04/09 12:42 PM
Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Copyright Wed 04/09 10:51 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding A Copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Wed 04/09 10:51 AM
Proposed Summons. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/09 10:50 AM
COMPLAINT against Window Innovations Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20546690.). Filed by Jeenah Moon.(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Photograph,
Att: 2 Exhibit Infringing Use of the Photograph,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet