California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 2:25-cv-03093
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 25STCV06954
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 1:04 PM PDT
Defendant
American Home Products Corporation
Defendant
Pfizer Inc.
Defendant
Pfizer Inc.,
Represented By
E. Alex Beroukhim
Arnold And Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wyeth
Defendant
Wyeth Ayerst Inc.
Represented By
E. Alex Beroukhim
Arnold And Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wyeth Company
Defendant
Wyeth Holdings LLC
Defendant
Wyeth LLC
Represented By
E. Alex Beroukhim
Arnold And Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wyeth Pharmaceuticals LLC
Defendant
Wyeth-Ayerst International LLC
Represented By
E. Alex Beroukhim
Arnold And Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alan Friedman


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
10 10 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 04/14 10:39 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendants Pfizer Inc.,, Wyeth Ayerst Inc., Wyeth LLC, Wyeth-Ayerst International LLC, re service of Docket Nos. 5, 6, 7 and Initial Standing Order served on April 11 and April 14, 2025. (Beroukhim, E.)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 04/14 10:25 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 5/15/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
Related: [-]
8 8 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 04/14 10:23 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 04/11 12:45 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 04/11 12:45 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 04/11 12:44 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Errata Fri 04/11 9:42 AM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Pfizer Inc.,, Wyeth Ayerst Inc., Wyeth LLC, Wyeth-Ayerst International LLC. correcting Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 (Beroukhim, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 16 to Notice of Removal
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 04/14 9:43 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO Complaint filed by defendants Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Inc.,, Wyeth Ayerst Inc., Wyeth LLC, Wyeth-Ayerst International LLC. in Los Angeles Superior Court on 4/8/25, see docket entry no.4 . (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 04/09 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Pfizer Inc.,, Wyeth Ayerst Inc., Wyeth LLC, Wyeth-Ayerst International LLC, identifying Wyeth Ayerst Inc. as a wholly owned subsidiary of Wyeth LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Pfizer Inc., and Pfizer Inc. has no parent corporation and no publicly held company owns 10% or more of its stock, and Wyeth-Ayerst International LLC's sole member is Wyeth Holdings LLC, which is an indirect wholly owned subsidiary of Pfizer Inc.. (Beroukhim, E.)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 04/09 12:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Pfizer Inc.,, Wyeth Ayerst Inc., Wyeth LLC, Wyeth-Ayerst International LLC. (Beroukhim, E.)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/09 12:52 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 25STCV06954 Receipt No: ACACDC-39472789 - Fee: $405, filed by defendants Wyeth-Ayerst International LLC, Wyeth LLC, Pfizer Inc.,, Wyeth Ayerst Inc.. (Attorney E. Alex Beroukhim added to party Pfizer Inc.,(pty:dft), Attorney E. Alex Beroukhim added to party Wyeth Ayerst Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney E. Alex Beroukhim added to party Wyeth LLC(pty:dft), Attorney E. Alex Beroukhim added to party Wyeth-Ayerst International LLC(pty:dft))(Beroukhim, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Proof of Service
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 04/11 1:01 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF OMPLAINT against Defendants American Home Products Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Inc.,Wyeth, Wyeth Ayerst Inc., Wyeth Company, Wyeth Holdings LLC, Wyeth LLC, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals LLC, Wyeth-Ayerst International LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Alan Friedman. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/10/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 04/11 1:05 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alan Friedman, upon Defendant Pfizer Inc. served on 3/14/2025, answer due 4/4/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp. By Leaving with Daisy Montenegro Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/28/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 7) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 04/11 1:08 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alan Friedman, upon Defendant Wyeth Holdings LLC served on 3/14/2025, answer due 4/4/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp. By Leaving with Daisy Montenegro Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/28/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 8) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 04/11 1:11 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alan Friedman, upon Plaintiff Wyeth LLC served on 3/14/2025, answer due 4/4/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp. By Leaving with Daisy Montenegro Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON3/28/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 3/28/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 9) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 04/11 1:14 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alan Friedman, upon Defendant Wyeth Pharmaceuticals LLC served on 3/16/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon 1818 Rolling Hills Road, Sacramento, CA 95864 in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/28/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 10) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 04/11 1:18 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alan Friedman, upon Defendant Wyeth served on 3/14/2025, answer due 4/4/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon c/o CSC Lawyers Inc. Service, by leaving with Alex Jenkins, associate intake coordinator in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/2/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 11) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 04/11 1:22 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alan Friedman, upon Defendant Wyeth-Ayerst International LLC served on 3/24/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Company, Agent for Service of Process, By Leaving with Robin Hutt Bank intake Clerk/Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/1/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 12) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 04/11 1:25 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alan Friedman, upon Defendant American Home Products Corporation served on 3/24/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Company, Agent for Service of Process, By Leaving with Robin Hutt Bank intake Clerk/Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/7/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 13) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 04/11 1:28 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alan Friedman, upon Defendant Wyeth Ayerst Inc. served on 3/13/2025, answer due 4/3/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Company, by leaving wit Robin Hutt-Banks, Clerk in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/7/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 14) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 04/11 1:31 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alan Friedman, upon Defendant Wyeth Company served on 3/13/2025, answer due 4/3/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon c/o Corporation Service Company, by leaving with Lynanne Gares, Clerk in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/7/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 15) (ghap)
Related: [-]