CIC Services, LLC v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Tennessee Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Travis R Mcdonough |
Referred: | Jill E Mccook |
Case #: | 3:25-cv-00146 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2025 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 5:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
Department of Treasury
|
|
Defendant
Internal Revenue Service
|
|
Defendant
Melanie Krause
|
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
|
Plaintiff
CIC Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 15, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by CIC Services, LLC. All Defendants. (Norris, Cameron) |
|
Monday, April 14, 2025 | ||
misc
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements
Mon 04/14 9:00 AM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , Matt Pociask ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNEDC-5963181.) filed by CIC Services, LLC (AFW) |
||
misc
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements
Mon 04/14 9:50 AM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kenneth A. Lazarus ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNEDC-5963417.) filed by CIC Services, LLC. (Certificate of Good Standing is over 30 days old, however the attorney's status of Good Standing has been confirmed) (AFW) |
||
Friday, April 11, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kenneth A. Lazarus ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNEDC-5963417.) by CIC Services, LLC.(Webber, Adam) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
10 | 10
![]() MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , Matt Pociask ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNEDC-5963181.) by CIC Services, LLC.(Norris, Cameron) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/11 10:59 AM
ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 04/11/2025. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (HSN) |
|
misc
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements
Fri 04/11 9:20 AM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for Adam Webber regarding document: 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNEDC-5961967.) filed by CIC Services, LLC (CAT) |
||
Thursday, April 10, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac): Attorneys Kenneth A Lazarus and Matt Pociask are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to attorney Matt Pociask) (AFW) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Summons Issued as to Internal Revenue Service, Melanie Krause, U.S. Department of Treasury, United States of America, and U.S. Attorney General. (AFW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
6 | 6
![]() MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNEDC-5961967.) by CIC Services, LLC.(Webber, Adam) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 04/10/2025. (Copy of Order mailed to Matt Pociask) (AFW) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 04/10/2025. (Copy of Order mailed to Matt Pociask) (AFW) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 04/10/2025. (Copy of Order mailed to Matt Pociask) (AFW) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 04/10 1:53 PM
District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (AFW) |
||
Wednesday, April 09, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Certificate of Corporate Interest by CIC Services, LLC. (Norris, Cameron) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5960871.), filed by CIC Services, LLC.(Norris, Cameron) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |