District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Beryl A Howell
Case #: 1:25-cv-01078
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 6:04 PM EDT
Defendant
KRANCLE ENVIEH
Defendant
FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Plaintiff
ZIYELLE KEARNEY
Represented By
Dionna Maria Lewis
District Legal Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 04/11 10:53 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Show Cause due by 4/18/2025. (mac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
3 3 order Standing Order Thu 04/10 5:33 PM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 10, 2025. (lcbah2)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Thu 04/10 9:56 AM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to KRANCLE ENVIEH, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/10 9:54 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (znmw)
Related: [-]
order .Order Thu 04/10 6:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING plaintiff, by April 18, 2025, to SHOW CAUSE why Hart v. FBI et al. , 25-cv-1077, should not be consolidated with the instant case, under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a)(2), since the plaintiffs in both cases seek tort damages against the same two defendants arising out of what appears to be the same motor vehicle accident. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 10, 2025. (lcbah2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/09 5:06 PM
COMPLAINT against KRANCLE ENVIEH, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11602954) filed by ZIYELLE KEARNEY.(Lewis, Dionna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons