California Central District Court
Judge:Serena R Murillo
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:25-cv-00731
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of Orange, 30-02025-01464892-CU-
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 4:08 PM PDT
Defendant
Mint Mobile, LLC
Represented By
Rachel E K Lowe
Alston And Bird LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Greg May


Docket last updated: 04/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Sunday, April 13, 2025
8 8 1 pgs notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Sun 04/13 11:07 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Sun 04/13 11:07 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Sun 04/13 11:06 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Serena R Murillo and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
5 5 notice Appearance Fri 04/11 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tracy Yao on behalf of Defendant Mint Mobile, LLC (Attorney Tracy Yao added to party Mint Mobile, LLC(pty:dft))(Yao, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 04/09 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mint Mobile, LLC, identifying T-Mobile USA, Inc.; Slingshot Holding Sub, LLC. (Lowe, Rachel)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Wed 04/09 3:47 PM
DECLARATION of Rachel Lowe re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Mint Mobile, LLC.(Lowe, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
2 2 3 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 04/09 3:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mint Mobile, LLC. (Lowe, Rachel)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/09 3:41 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Orange, case number 30-2025 01464892-CU-NP-CXC with filing fee previously paid ($405 paid on 04/09/2025, receipt number ACACDC-39475584), filed by Defendant Mint Mobile, LLC. (Attorney Rachel E K Lowe added to party Mint Mobile, LLC(pty:dft))(Lowe, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Sun 04/13 10:45 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, Mint Mobile, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Greg May. Filed in State Court on 3/5/2025 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]