California Central District Court
Judge:Fred W Slaughter
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:25-cv-00732
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Case in other court:Orange County Superior Court, 30-02025-01463172
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 6:03 PM PDT
Defendant
N. Harris Computer Corporation
Represented By
Lindsay David
Polsinelli
contact info
Defendant
PICIS Clinical Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Lindsay David
Polsinelli
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Place


Docket last updated: 04/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
10 10 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 04/11 1:13 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants N. Harris Computer Corporation, PICIS Clinical Solutions, Inc., re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form5 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form7 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 served on April 9, 2025 and April 10, 2025.(David, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 04/11 8:17 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Scheduling Conference is set for 6/5/2025 at 9:00 a.m. **Counsel shall review full Order for details.** (rrp)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 04/11 8:16 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (rrp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 04/10 12:53 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 04/10 12:53 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 04/10 12:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 04/09 5:47 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant PICIS Clinical Solutions, Inc., identifying Constellation Software, Inc.. (David, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 04/09 5:45 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant N. Harris Computer Corporation, identifying Constellation Software, Inc.. (David, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 04/09 5:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants N. Harris Computer Corporation, PICIS Clinical Solutions, Inc.. (David, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/09 5:26 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2025 01463172-CU-WT-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-39477515 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendants N. Harris Computer Corporation, PICIS Clinical Solutions, Inc.. (Attorney Lindsay David added to party N. Harris Computer Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsay David added to party PICIS Clinical Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(David, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Service Packet,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Answer to Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Docket,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Jill De Cino
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Thu 04/10 12:57 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through50, inclusive, N. Harris Computer Corporation, PICIS Clinical Solutions, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Steven Place. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/26/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Thu 04/10 12:59 PM
NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants N. Harris Computer Corporation, PICIS Clinical Solutions, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 3)(ghap)
Related: [-]