New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela K Chen
Referred: James R Cho
Case #: 1:25-cv-01987
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 1:06 AM EDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
475 Anton Boulevard
Costa Mesa, CA 92626
Defendant
TD Bank, N.A.
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
Plaintiff
Eman Youssef
Represented By
Kevin Christopher Mallon
Mallon Consumer Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 04/10 2:59 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Thu 04/10 2:59 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (KD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/10 2:58 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Thu 04/10 3:00 PM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must be a rider attached to the one (1)Proposed summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included. Do not file a separate proposed summons for each defendant. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (KD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/09 7:04 PM
COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TD Bank, N.A., Trans Union, LLC filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18938142 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Eman Youssef. (Mallon, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons