New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joanna Seybert
Referred: James M Wicks
Case #: 2:25-cv-01985
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 1:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Ross Health Care Center, Inc.
Defendant
Ross Opco LLC
Defendant
Peretz Stein
Defendant
Agnes Zitter
Plaintiff
Joseph Lanoue
Represented By
Matthew John Farnworth
Romero Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 04/10 10:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Ross Health Care Center, Inc., Ross Opco LLC, Peretz Stein, Agnes Zitter. (SMF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Thu 04/10 10:39 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SMF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 04/10 10:35 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SMF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/10 10:38 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SMF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/09 6:30 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18938091 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Joseph Lanoue. (Farnworth, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit B