Case Filed:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 4:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Kelly Nicole Johnson (2)
Represented By
Jennifer A. Dominguez
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan Taylor ONeal (1)
Represented By
Mitchell G. Styers
Banzet, Thompson, Styers & May, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Philip L Aubart
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/10/2025 5:25 AM EDT
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Jonathan Taylor ONeal (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, Kelly Nicole Johnson (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 8, 9. The foreperson's signature has been redacted pursuant to the E-Government Act. The unredacted version of this document has been filed under seal. (Pendergrass, C)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Seal1 Indictment (Sealed), filed by USA as to Jonathan Taylor ONeal, Kelly Nicole Johnson. (Pendergrass, C)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal as to Jonathan Taylor ONeal (1), Kelly Nicole Johnson (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 3/11/2025. (Pendergrass, C)
Related: [-]
4 4 Unredacted Document1 Indictment (Sealed), (Pendergrass, C)
Related: [-]
5 5 Warrant Requested by USA as to Kelly Nicole Johnson. (Pendergrass, C) Modified on 3/12/2025 (Pendergrass, C).
Related: [-]
6 6 Arrest Warrant Issued by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court in case as to Kelly Nicole Johnson. Original to US Marshal's Office for service. (Pendergrass, C)
Related: [-]
7 7 Penalty Sheet (Selected Participants Only) as to Jonathan Taylor ONeal (Pendergrass, C)
Related: [-]
8 8 Penalty Sheet (Selected Participants Only) as to Kelly Nicole Johnson (Pendergrass, C)
Related: [-]