New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Natasha C Merle
Referred: Peggy Kuo
Case #: 1:25-cv-01990
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 8:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Bob's Discount Furniture, LLC
Goldberg Segalla LLP 200 Garden City Plaza Suite 520
Garden City, NY 11530
Represented By
Gavin Fields
Goldberg Segalla LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nefertiti Granville
The Law Office of Matthew W, Lewis, PLLC 11 Broadway Suite 615
New York, NY 10004
Plaintiff
Ricardo Green
The Law Office of Matthew W. Lewis, PLLC 11 Broadway Suite 615
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
6 6 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/14 4:27 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on May 22, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By May 16, 2025 , the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the [LINK:Proposed Discovery Plan] . Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Defendant's counsel is directed to ensure that Plaintiffs are aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/14/2025. (RO)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 04/11 12:35 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 04/11 12:35 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CV)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/11 12:34 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Natasha C. Merle and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CV)
Related: [-]
misc ECF Admission and Registration Notification - Removal Fri 04/11 12:35 PM
This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (CV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/10 12:00 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bob's Discount Furniture, LLC identifying Corporate Parent BDF Acquisition Corp. for Bob's Discount Furniture, LLC. (Fields, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/10 7:51 AM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Notice of Removal,, by Bob's Discount Furniture, LLC (Fields, Gavin)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 04/10 7:48 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bob's Discount Furniture, LLC from Supreme Court, Queens County, case number 715971/20254. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYEDC-18938376) (Fields, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Verified Answer of Def. Bob's Discount Furniture, LLC,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Plaintiffs'Amended Response to Defendant's Combined Demands,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Preliminary Conference Order,
Att: 5 Exhibit E-Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendant's Interrogatories,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service