New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Cheryl L Pollak
Case #: 1:25-cv-01996
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 11:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Hamido Seafood, Corp.
Plaintiff
Jeenah Moon
Represented By
Craig B. Sanders
Sanders Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Report on Copyright AO121 Tue 04/15 11:21 AM
Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (RC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 complaint
Monday, April 14, 2025
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 04/14 10:15 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 04/14 10:13 AM
Summons Issued as to Hamido Seafood, Corp.. (SDM)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Mon 04/14 10:09 AM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (SDM)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/14 10:04 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/10 10:35 AM
COMPLAINT against Hamido Seafood, Corp. filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18939118, filed by Jeenah Moon. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Photograph,
Att: 2 Exhibit Infringing uses of Photograph,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Summons,
Att: 5 Supplement AO121,
Att: 6 Supplement Certificate of Interested Parties