District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Reggie B Walton
Case #: 1:25-cv-01083
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause01DCC2439 WMATA (court jurisdiction)
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 1:08 PM EDT
Defendant
WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Represented By
Neal Marcellas Janey, Jr.
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIE GRAYEYES


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel/Party Mon 04/14 9:15 AM
NOTICE to Counsel/Party re1 Notice of Removal,(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/14 9:14 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
4 4 misc Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents Mon 04/14 8:11 AM
Receipt on 04/11/2025 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2025-CAB-000216. (zjm)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED) Fri 04/11 2:36 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY re Notice of Error- New Case,1 Notice of Removal, filed by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY. Related document: Notice of Error- New Case,1 Notice of Removal, filed by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY.(Janey, Neal)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Error- New Case Fri 04/11 7:48 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Notice of Removal,. The following error(s) need correction: Incorrect civil cover sheet. Please locate the Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) form at www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
2 2 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Thu 04/10 12:25 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Janey, Neal)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Thu 04/10 12:23 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In the Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2025-CAB-000216 Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADCDC-11605146 filed by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY.(Janey, Neal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet USDC,
Att: 2 Exhibit Filing of Previous,
Att: 3 Exhibit Writ of Summons,
Att: 4 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit Civil Information Sheet,
Att: 6 Exhibit Initial Order