New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Marcia M Henry
Case #: 1:25-cv-02008
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Case in other court:Supreme Court of the State of New York, Co of NY, 004250
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 3:07 PM EDT
Defendant
TransUnion LLC
Represented By
Andrew George Hope
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Giuseppe Azzara


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 04/14 9:01 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Mon 04/14 8:59 AM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (CV)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/14 8:58 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CV)
Related: [-]
misc ECF Admission and Registration Notification - Removal Mon 04/14 8:59 AM
This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (CV)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/11 4:04 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Notice of Removal, by TransUnion LLC (Hope, Andrew)
Related: [-]
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/11 3:30 PM
Notice: Re: Certification of Arbitration Eligibility not completed The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
2 2 misc Affidavit/Affirmation Thu 04/10 3:04 PM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re1 Notice of Removal, Affidavit of Service by Mail by TransUnion LLC (Hope, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 04/10 2:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TransUnion LLC from County of Queens, Supreme Court of the State of New York, case number 004250-25. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYEDC-18941009) (Hope, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet