New York Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:25-cv-02014
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 4:06 PM EDT
Defendant
304 Paddock Road LLC
56 Main Street # 303
Springfield, VT 05156
Defendant
F and M Enterprises LLC
Represented By
Robert S. Mazzuchin
Brand Glick & Brand, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Anthony W Falzo
Represented By
Robert S. Mazzuchin
Brand Glick & Brand, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Colin Dennis Colebrook


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/14 11:35 AM
Notice: Case Requires Newly Updated Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed JS-44 Related [+] Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. The form is available at:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/forms/js-44-civil-cover-sheet] . Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (SDM)
Related: [-] v. 02.13.2025; Effective 02.17.2025
Thursday, April 10, 2025
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/10 3:57 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by F and M Enterprises LLC, Anthony W Falzo (Mazzuchin, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/10 3:47 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Notice of Removal, by F and M Enterprises LLC, Anthony W Falzo (Mazzuchin, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 04/10 3:41 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by F and M Enterprises LLC, Anthony W Falzo from Supreme Court - Kings County, case number 530241/2023. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYEDC-18941802) (Mazzuchin, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh A - S&C,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh B - Answer,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh C - Vermont Sec of State Registration,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh D - Plt Ad Damnum Response