New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Nusrat J Choudhury
Referred: Lee G Dunst
Case #: 2:25-cv-02029
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity - Legal Malpractice
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 1:08 AM EDT
Defendant
J Douglas Barics
Defendant
Elliott Blumenthal
Plaintiff
Peter Kelman
Represented By
Alexander Edward Eisemann
Alexander E. Eisemann
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
9 9 service Summons Issued Mon 04/14 9:59 AM
Summons Issued as to J. Douglas Barics, Elliot J. Blumenthal, Law Office of J. Douglas Barics, Law Offices of Elliot J. Blumenthal, PLLC. (SMF)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 04/14 9:47 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SMF)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 04/14 9:39 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (SMF)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Mon 04/14 9:31 AM
FILING FEE: $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18942961 (SMF)
Related: [-]
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Mon 04/14 9:33 AM
Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information. Added Defendant Law Offices of Elliot J. Blumenthal, PLLC and Law Office of J. Douglas Barics to the case to conform to the Complaint. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 (Complaint and Attachments) and re-entered as against all Defendants. (SMF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/14 9:46 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Nusrat J. Choudhury and Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SMF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
6 6 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/11 4:56 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,,,,,, by Peter Kelman (Eisemann, Alexander)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/11 4:55 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,,,,,, by Peter Kelman (Eisemann, Alexander)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/11 4:54 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,,,,,, by Peter Kelman (Eisemann, Alexander)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/11 4:53 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,,,,,, by Peter Kelman (Eisemann, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/10 11:52 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint,,,,, by Peter Kelman (Eisemann, Alexander)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/10 11:38 PM
COMPLAINT against J. Douglas Barics, Elliot J. Blumenthal, Law Office of J. Douglas Barics, Law Offices of Elliot J. Blumenthal, PLLC Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Peter Kelman. (SMF) Modified on 4/14/2025 (SMF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit M/L Statement of Account,
Att: 2 Exhibit Justice Steinman Order 9/13/2021,
Att: 3 Exhibit Blumenthal Engagement Letter 10/20/21,
Att: 4 Exhibit Email from Plaintiff to Blumenthal 10/26/21,
Att: 5 Exhibit Email from Blumenthal to Plaintiff 11/8/21,
Att: 6 Exhibit Letter from Blumenthal to Justice Steinman 11/9/21,
Att: 7 Exhibit Email from Plaintiff to Blumenthal 12/9/21,
Att: 8 Exhibit Email from Plaintiff to Blumenthal 12/14/21,
Att: 9 Exhibit Blumenthal cross motion 12/24/21,
Att: 10 Exhibit Justice Quinn Short Form of Order 8/11/22,
Att: 11 Exhibit Email from Blumenthal to Plaintiff 8/15/22,
Att: 12 Exhibit Blumenthal Notice of Withdrawal 1/12/23,
Att: 13 Exhibit Justice Quinn Decision after Trial 10/26/23,
Att: 14 Exhibit Barics Internet Web Site,
Att: 15 Exhibit Barics Engagement Letter 8/22/23,
Att: 16 Exhibit Email from Barics to Plaintiff 11/7/23,
Att: 17 Exhibit Email exchange between Plaintiff and Barics 11/7/23,
Att: 18 Exhibit Email from Plaintiff to Barics 11/13/23,
Att: 19 Exhibit Email from Plaintiff to Barics 11/16/23,
Att: 20 Exhibit Dismissal of Appeal 2/28/24,
Att: 21 Exhibit Motion to Vacate Dismissal of Appeal - 7/1/2024,
Att: 22 Exhibit Denial of Motion to Vacate Dismissal of Appeal 9/13/24